Adam, John Edward (CPSO#: 18499)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 151 Robson Court Kanata ON K2K 2W1
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017