Adam, Josee (CPSO#: 79038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Rue Chamberland
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2006