Adam, Rogelia Fausta Rocca (CPSO#: 52477)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Main National University of San Marcos, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 200 474 College Street Toronto, ON M6G 1A4
Date Received: 01 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 03 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2014