Adamkiewicz, Thomas Vincent (CPSO#: 67456)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Montreal, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1997