Adamo, Ciro Anthony (CPSO#: 57232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
2010 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 2K3
Phone: (416) 781-2050
Fax: (416) 781-1910
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIRO ANTHONY ADAMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Nov 2005
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 15 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Sep 2005
Summary:

 On September 2, 2005, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Adamo committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
 registration, he falsified a record relating to his practice and he engaged in conduct or an act 
 or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On November 
 15, 2005, the Discipline Committee delivered its penalty order. On December 14, 2005, Dr. Adamo 
 appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee regarding the findings of professional 
 misconduct and penalty to the Divisional Court. On March 30, 2007, the Divisional Court upheld the 
 findings and allowed the appeal with respect to penalty.  

Therefore, the following penalty is in 
 effect.

Dr. Adamo is to appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

The following term, condition 
 and limitation is imposed on Dr. Adamo's certificate of registration:
(i) Dr. Adamo shall complete 
 a course in medical ethics approved by the College, at his own expense, and shall provide proof of 
 having done so to the Registrar of the College or his designate on or before May 31, 2007.

The 
 results of this proceeding are to be included on the register.

Dr. Adamo is to pay the College 
 costs in the amount of $5000.00.

On December 14, 2005, Dr. Adamo appealed the decision of the 
 Discipline Committee regarding the findings of professional misconduct and penalty to the 
 Divisional Court. On March 30, 2007, the Divisional Court upheld the findings and allowed the 
 appeal with respect to penalty.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 30 Mar 2007
Hearing Date(s): Apr 04, 2005