Adams, Amanda Jane (CPSO#: 70110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Tumber, Amanda Jane (used until: 12 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adams ( CPSO# 70110 )
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 72457 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-8504

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA JANE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998