Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Adams, Barrett Robert (CPSO#: 18562)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Gravelle Smyth Medical Centre Suite 220 1929 Russell Road Ottawa, ON K1G 4G3 Telephone: 613-737-7707
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015