Adams, Frank Steven (CPSO#: 43893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Oct 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 20 Mar 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Apr 2000
Summary:

On April 14, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Adams guilty of professional misconduct 
in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  In addition the Committee 
found him incompetent.  (Dr. Adams is under a section 37 interim order - see regview for more 
detail). 
 
On October 6, 2000, the Discipline Committee made the following order as to penalty, which 
was further amended on December 14, 2000, to include paragraphs 2a), 2b) and 2c). 
 
1)    Dr. Adams is to be reprimanded and such reprimand is to be recorded on the register. 
 
   2) The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Adams’ certificate of registration, except as is 
      hereinafter provided in the amended order, until he has successfully completed, at his own 
      expense, with a practice supervisor, a program that is designed or approved by the College, 
      that establishes that he has the appropriate knowledge, skill and judgment to perform and 
      interpret conventional history taking and physical examination, which includes mental status 
      assessment. 
       
   a)       Dr. Adams shall be permitted to retain a restricted form of certificate of registration 
            which  will  limit  his  practice  to  the  examination  of  patients  under  the direct 
            supervision of a preceptor in an academic setting, for as long as he is taking the 
            program designed or approved by the college 
   b)       The  preceptor  shall  be  the  practice  supervisor  for  the  purpose  of  the  program 
            specified in this order, and the program shall involve assessment, remediation, and 
            reassessment in the areas of concern identified under paragraph 2. 
   c)       The College shall require as a measure of the successful completion of the program 
            the delivery by the preceptor of a written report satisfactory to the Registrar that states 
            that Dr. Adams has the appropriate knowledge, skill and judgment to perform and 
            interpret conventional history-taking and physical examination, including mental 
            status assessment. 
   3) Upon his return to practice, following the filing of proof with the Registrar of Dr. Adams’ 
      successful completion of the program required in paragraph 2, the Registrar shall be directed 
      to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations upon Dr. Adams’ certificate of 
      registration; 
    
      a)    Dr. Adams shall immediately implement, in his practice, the Consensus Statement 
         and Guidelines from the Canadian Pain Society, or such other guidelines as may be 
         approved subsequently by the College regarding the use of opioid analgesics for the 
         treatment of chronic non-cancer pain, including: 
                  i.    the addiction screening questions regarding opioid therapy in patient 
                        histories; 
                 ii.    the points of discussion regarding opioid therapy in patient histories, 
                        and;   
                 iii.   utilization of a patient agreement for those patients at high risk for 
                        non-compliance with opioid therapy. 
                 
   b) Dr. Adams shall provide no more than a two-week supply of narcotic medication to 
      any patient, whether by way of repeat, refill, partial fill, or new prescription, without 
      seeing and assessing the patient to determine whether further narcotic medication is 
      required and, if so, the appropriate dosage of any further narcotic medication. 
   c) Dr. Adams shall see and assess those patients who are currently being treated by him 
      by way of parenteral administration of opioids every two weeks or less, with the 
      intent of either discontinuing the parenteral administration of opioids or transferring 
      of  the  care  of  such  patients  to  a  physician  who  is  capable  of  managing  these 
      problems. 
   d) Dr. Adams shall not use parenteral administration of opioids in his practice. 
   e) Dr. Adams shall see and assess those patients whom he is treating by stabilized oral 
      doses of opioids every 60 days or less. 
   f) Dr. Adams shall monitor monthly the hepatic and renal functions of any patients who 
      are being treated with 4 grams or more of acetaminophen daily. 
   g) Dr. Adams shall assist the College in monitoring his compliance with the terms, 
      conditions and limitations in paragraphs (a) to (f) above, by participating in a review 
      by the College of pharmacy records as described in paragraph (h). 
   h) Dr. Adams will consent to a review of his clinical practise.  This review together with 
      review of the pharmacy records, will be performed by an assessor satisfactory to the 
      Registrar who will report the findings to the Registrar, initially at six months and 
      subsequently every year thereafter for three years from the date of commencement of 
      the  penalty.    Dr.  Adams  will  be  responsible  for  all  costs  associated  with  these 
      assessments and reports.  If the reports are not satisfactory to the Registrar during the 
      period of monitoring, the Registrar will take such action as deemed appropriate. 
              
4.    The  Registrar  shall  be  directed to  further suspend indefinitely the certificate of 
registration  of  Dr.  Adams  if  he  breaches the  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  on  his 
certificate of registration, that are set out in paragraphs 3(a) to (h) of this Order. 
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Aug 09, 1999