Adams, Jennifer Helen (CPSO#: 84526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University
Suite 2600
Technology and Training Centre
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Fax: (613) 520-4059
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Canada
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 84526 )

Business Address:
2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone Number: (613) 244-4400

Business Address:
2600 - 1125 University Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER HELEN ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008