Adams, Karen (CPSO#: 87696)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 15 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009