Adams, Kenneth Werezak (CPSO#: 52136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Werezak, Kenneth Guy (used until: 10 Jun 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
20 DeBoers Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0H1
Phone: (416) 633-3905
Fax: (416) 633-3907
Electoral District: 10

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 May 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 15 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., May 15, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Kenneth Werezak Adams:

            Instruction in Medical Ethics

            a.    At his own expense, Dr. Adams shall participate in and successfully
                  complete, within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized
                  instruction in medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an
                  instructor approved by the College.  The instructor shall provide a
                  summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about
                  whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Adams;

            Clinical Supervision

            b.    Prior to resuming practice following the suspension of his certificate of
                  registration described above in paragraph 2, Dr. Adams shall retain, at
                  his own expense, a College-approved clinical supervisor to review Dr.
                  Adams' medical record keeping, who will sign an undertaking in the form
                  attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Clinical Supervisor");  

            c.    For a period of six (6) months commencing within thirty (30) days from
                  the date Dr. Adams resumes practice following the suspension of his
                  certificate of registration described above in paragraph 2, Dr. Adams may
                  practice only on terms of the Clinical Supervision set out herein and in
                  "Appendix A";

            d.    Clinical Supervision of Dr. Adams practice shall contain the following
                  elements:

                        (i)   Meet with Dr.  Adams on a monthly basis and review a minimum
                              of 15 charts for the duration of the supervision, to be
                              selected in the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor;
                        (ii)  the Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                              reviewed along with patient identifiers; and
                        (iii) the Clinical Supervisor will provide reports to the College
                              on a monthly basis for the six (6) month period of practice
                              monitoring, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about Dr. Adams' standard of practice or conduct.
                  
            e.    Dr. Adams shall abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor;

            f.    If a clinical supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in
                  Schedule "A" to this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill
                  its terms, Dr. Adams shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice
                  of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a person
                  who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                  College within that time;

            g.    If Dr. Adams is unable to obtain a clinical supervisor in accordance with
                  this Order, he shall cease to practice until such time as he has done so;

            h.    Dr. Adams shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to
                  the College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and
                  Dr. Adams' compliance with this Order;

            i.    Dr. Adams shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practices including but not limited to hospital, clinics and offices, in
                  any jurisdiction (collectively his "Practice Location(s)), within fifteen
                  (15) days of this order and shall inform the College of any new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location, for the purposes of monitoring his compliance with this Order;

            Re-Assessment

            j.    Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of
                  supervision as set out above Dr. Adams shall undergo a re-assessment of
                  his medical record keeping by a College-appointed assessor (the
                  "Assessor(s)").  The Assessor(s) shall report the results of the
                  re-assessment to the College;

            k.    Dr. Adams shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the
                  reports of the Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and
                  shall consent to the sharing of all information between the Clinical
                  Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as the College deems
                  necessary or desirable.

            As from October 17, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kenneth Werezak
            Adams, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Adams to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING,  ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND  CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    KENNETH WEREZAK ADAMS
                                          ("Dr. Adams'')
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking;

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, I991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; and 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee at the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Adams, certificate of registration number 52136, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7213212 (the "Investigation") into my
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Adams, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake that, effective immediately, l will
                        restrict my surgical practice to hair transplantation procedures,
                        necessary ancillary procedures and commonly performed minor
                        procedures of the skin and subcutaneous tissues. For greater
                        certainty, I will not perform any surgical procedures except:
                  
                        1.    Hair Transplantation procedures, including:
                  
                              a.    Follicular Unit Extraction  Hair Transplant;
                              b.    Hair Transplantation using Donor Strip Harvesting with
                                    Tumescence;
                              c.    Hair Transplant Scar Removal or Revision.
                  
                        2.    The Following Minor Procedures of the Skin and Subcutaneous
                              Tissues:

                              a.    Incision and drainage of abscesses or hematomas;
                              b.    Removal by excision and suture of keratoses, pyogenic,
                                    granulomas, lipomas, sebaceous cysts;
                              c.    Suturing minor cuts and lacerations;
                              d.    Planter wart removal; and
                              e.    Partial nail resection for ingrown toenails.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purpose of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquires of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
                        any person or institution that may have relevant information, in
                        order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions
                        of this Undertaking.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to comply with the provisions of the Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's  Register  that is available to
                  the public  during the  time  period  that the Undertaking remains in
                  effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        restrict my surgical practice to hair transplantation procedures,
                        necessary ancillary procedures and commonly performed minor
                        procedures of the skin and subcutaneous tissues. For greater
                        certainty, l will not perform any surgical procedures  except:
                  
                        1.    Hair Transplantation procedures, including:
                              a.    Follicular Unit Extraction Hair Transplant;
                              b.    Hair Transplantation using Donor Strip Harvesting with
                                    Tumescence;
                              c.    Hair Transplant Scar Removal or Revision.
                  
                        2.    The Following Minor Procedures of the Skin and Subcutaneous
                              Tissues:
                              a.    Incision and drainage of abscesses or hematomas;
                              b.    Removal by excision and suture of keratoses, pyogenic,
                                    granulomas, lipomas, sebaceous  cysts;
                              c.    Suturing minor cuts and lacerations;
                              d.    Planter wart removal; and
                              e.    Partial nail resection for ingrown toenails.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff , or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide  said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.




Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 May 2017
Summary:

On May 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kennet Werezak Adams committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
  
Dr. Adams received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in 
1983. At the relevant time, he practised medicine in Toronto. 
 
FAILURE TO MAINTAIN STANDARD OF PRACTICE 
 
On January 26, 2014 Patient A complained to the College about the care he received from Dr. 
Adams.  
 
In August 2010, Dr. Adams provided a serious of four filler injections to Patient A in an attempt 
to correct hollows in his cheeks resulting from cosmetic procedures (liposuction and fat removal) 
several years prior with another physician. 
 
For the injections, Dr. Adams used hyaluronic acid that was compounded at a compounding 
pharmacy as a filler, rather than a filler that was commercially available and approved by Health 
Canada. 
 
Although Patient A was initially pleased with the result of the injections, the effects dissipated 
rapidly and the hollows re-appeared. In addition, about three months after beginning the series of 
injections, Patient A noticed what he described as a “rather ugly, hook or bow-shaped 
demarcation” above the jaw line on his face. Patient A’s family physician confirmed to the 
College that Patient A was left with a hard 1 cm mobile lump over his left mandible. 
 
Dr. Adams provided a series of injections of Hyaluronidase, but the attempts to dissolve the lump 
were unsuccessful. 
 
The College retained an expert certified in dermatology, who concluded that Dr. Adams failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession in that he displayed a lack of judgment in using 
a compounded form of hyaluronic acid which is not commercially available. The expert noted that 
the use of compounded product is not the standard of practice. The expert further noted that 
perhaps in very rare instances where someone may have allergy to a component of the product, 
using a compounded product can be considered.  However, this comes with risks and patients 
must be aware of these risks. The expert pointed out that there was no patient consent form in 
Patient A’s chart and no documentation of potential side effects.   
 
Commercial fillers have labels attached to them and the label is commonly affixed to the patient 
chart to confirm the dose and brand used and allows for tracking if there is something faulty with 
the filler. In this case, there was no label because Dr. Adams used a compounded filler.   
 
The expert recommended that Dr. Adams use only commercially available fillers going forward 
and ensure that the patient records contain a signed consent form in respect of the treatment 
provided. 
 
DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE OR UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 
 
On July 20, 2016, the College received a complaint from the Associate Dean of a University, 
indicating that Dr. Adams had provided a medical note, dated April 22, 2016, for a student, for the 
purpose of seeking accommodation from an instructor at the University. The student is Dr. 
Adams’ family member.  
                                        
The instructor who received the medical note became suspicious, because the note indicated the 
student was incapacitated during a period in which the student had written an exam and because 
all possible symptoms had been checked off on the form.   
 
When the instructor telephoned the number indicated on the medical note, which is Dr. Adams’ 
private cellular telephone number, Dr. Adams confirmed that he had provided care to the student 
and would continue to do so. Dr. Adams did not reveal the fact that the student was his family 
member in the initial telephone conversation with the instructor. 
 
In addition to the note dated April 22, 2016, Dr. Adams’ authored four other medical notes for his 
family member submitted to the University.   
 
In his response to the College investigation, Dr. Adams confirmed that the student is in fact his 
family member and confirmed that he had written the five medical notes provided to the College 
by the University. He also confirmed that had provided medical care to his family member. 
  
According to Dr. Adams’ family member’s patient charts dating from April 2010 to December 
2013 and from April to July 2016, Dr. Adams provided medical treatment for his family member. 
In addition, he has provided and billed OHIP for treatment for his family member on two 
occasions in May and July 2016.  
 
In his response to the College regarding the OHIP billings, Dr. Adams acknowledged that he 
ought not to have billed OHIP. Dr Adams has repaid OHIP for this improper billing.  
 
The care that Dr. Adams provided to his family member violates professional boundaries and is 
contrary to professional obligations articulated in College Policy, which prohibits physicians from 
providing treatment for themselves or family members except:  
 
   i)    for a minor condition or in an emergency situation, and 
   ii)   when another qualified health-care professional is not readily available.   
          
These conditions were not present when Dr. Adams repeatedly treated his family member. 
 
 
On May 15, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Adams’ certificate of registration for a three (3) month period 
   commencing June 3, 2017, at 12:01 a.m. 
-  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Adams’ Certificate 
   of Registration:  
    
                 
Instruction in Medical Ethics 
(a) At his own expense, Dr. Adams shall participate in and successfully complete, within 6 
   months  of  the  date  of  this  Order,  individualized  instruction  in  medical  ethics 
   satisfactory to the College, with an instructor approved by the College.  The instructor 
   shall provide a summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about 
   whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Adams. 
Clinical Supervision 
(b) Prior to resuming practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration, 
   Dr. Adams shall retain, at his own expense, a College-approved clinical supervisor to 
   review  Dr.  Adams’  medical  record  keeping,  who  will  sign  an  undertaking as  the 
   “Clinical Supervisor”;   
(c) For a period of six (6) months commencing within thirty (30) days from the date Dr. 
   Adams resumes practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration, Dr. 
   Adams may practice only on terms of the Clinical Supervision set out herein; 
(d) Clinical Supervision of Dr. Adams practice shall contain the following elements: 
      (i)   Meet with Dr.  Adams on a monthly basis and review a minimum of 15 
            charts  for  the  duration  of  the  supervision,  to  be  selected  in  the  sole 
            discretion of the Clinical Supervisor; 
      (ii)  the Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along 
            with patient identifiers; and 
      (iii) the  Clinical  Supervisor will  provide  reports  to  the  College  on  a  monthly 
            basis  for  the  six  (6)  month  period  of  practice  monitoring,  or  more 
            frequently  if  the  Clinical  Supervisor  has  concerns  about  Dr.  Adams’ 
            standard of practice or conduct. 
(e) Dr. Adams shall abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor; 
(f) If a clinical supervisor who has given an undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue 
   to  fulfill  its terms,  Dr.  Adams  shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of 
   same,  obtain  an executed  undertaking  in  the  same  form  from  a  person  who  is 
   acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time; 
(g) If Dr. Adams is unable to obtain a clinical supervisor in accordance with this Order, he 
   shall cease to practice until such time as he has done so; 
(h) Dr. Adams shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the College, 
   and  by  the  College  to  his  Clinical  Supervisor,  of  all  information  the  Clinical 
   Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
   Supervisor’s undertaking and Dr. Adams’ compliance with this Order; 
(i) Dr.  Adams  shall  inform  the  College  of  each  and every  location  where  he  practises 
   including  but  not  limited  to  hospital,  clinics  and  offices,  in  any  jurisdiction 
   (collectively his “Practice Location(s)), within fifteen (15) days of this order and shall 
   inform  the  College  of  any  new  Practice  Locations  within  fifteen  (15)  days  of 
   commencing practice at that location, for the purposes of monitoring his compliance 
   with this Order. 
Re-Assessment 
(j) Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of supervision as set 
   out above Dr. Adams shall undergo a re-assessment of his medical record keeping by a 
   College-appointed  assessor  (the “Assessor(s)”).    The  Assessor(s)  shall  report  the 
   results of the re-assessment to the College; 
      (k) Dr. Adams shall  consent  to  the  disclosure  to  the  Assessor(s)  of  the  reports  of  the 
         Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing of all 
         information between the Clinical Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as the 
         College deems necessary or desirable. 
-  Dr. Adams be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing this Order. 
-  Dr. Adams to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Adams pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 within 
   30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 15, 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth Werezak Adams to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 17, 2016:

I, Dr. Adams, undertake that, effective immediately, I will restrict my surgical practice to hair transplantation procedures, necessary ancillary procedures and commonly performed minor procedures of the skin and subcutaneous tissues. For greater certainty, l will not perform any surgical procedures except:

1. Hair Transplantation procedures, including:

- Follicular Unit Extraction Hair Transplant;
- Hair Transplantation using Donor Strip Harvesting with Tumescence;
- Hair Transplant Scar Removal or Revision.

2. The Following Minor Procedures of the Skin and Subcutaneous Tissues:

- Incision and drainage of abscesses or hematomas;
- Removal by excision and suture of keratoses, pyogenic, granulomas, lipomas, sebaceous cysts;
- Suturing minor cuts and lacerations;
- Planter wart removal; and
- Partial nail resection for ingrown toenails.