Adams, Mark Edward (CPSO#: 28844)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1989