Adams, Martha Elaine (CPSO#: 50050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1N7
Phone: (416) 425-6095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adams ( CPSO# 50050 )

Business Address:
35 Rumsey Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1N7
Phone Number: (416) 425-6095

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA ELAINE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983