Adams, Paul Clifford (CPSO#: 43214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 35375
Fax: (519) 663-3549
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Clifford Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Adams ( CPSO# 43214 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
ALL-130
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL CLIFFORD ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988