Adams, Robert Frederick (CPSO#: 72085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Highway 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: 613 525 2222
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 27, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Frederick
            Adams, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Adams to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROBERT FREDERICK ADAMS
                                          ("Dr. Adams") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Adams, certificate of registration number 72085, am a member of
                  the College.The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (2)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7213973 (the "Investigation") into
                  allegations that I engaged in professional misconduct by failing to
                  maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or am incompetent
                  in my emergency medicine practice

            (3)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge and agree that, upon receiving an original copy
                  of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no
                  further action on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Adams, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

            (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                  Supervisor, who is acceptable to the College (the "Supervisor"), for a
                  period of twelve (12) months.

            (b)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Supervisor(s)'s
                  undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is
                  required of the Supervisor(s), including, at minimum:

                  (i)   Facilitating the education program set out in the Individualized
                        Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix "B";
                  (ii)  Meeting with me at least once every two(2) weeks for a minimum of
                        two (2) months to discuss any concerns arising from the chart
                        reviews, and with the approval of the College, thereafter, monthly
                        for a period of ten (10) months.
                  
                  (iii) A review of at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts per meeting,
                        which shall be selected by the Supervisor(s);
                  
                  (iv)  Making recommendations to me for practice improvements;
                  
                  (v)   Submitting written reports to the College at least once every
                        quarter, or more frequently if the Supervisor(s) has concerns about
                        my standard of practice; and
                  
                  (vi)  Making recommendations to me for ongoing professional development.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by
                  the Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in the IEP
                  set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas of
                  concern identified in the report(s) of Dr. Walters, dated February 25,
                  2015, May 5, 2015, May 7, 2015 and July 8, 2015, and concerns that may
                  arise during the period of supervision and will include a review of every
                  chart of a patient that requires acute cardiac resuscitation (use of
                  antiarrhythmics, electrical therapy or inotropes) AND all patients
                  requiring active airway control.

            (d)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision of my
                  practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and Appendix "A"
                  and "B" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                  Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended practice
                  improvements and ongoing professional development.

            (e)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking
                  is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the
                  date I execute this Undertaking.

            (f)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in
                  Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to
                  fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice
                  of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly
                  qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is
                  delivered to the College within that time.

            (g)   I, Dr. Adams, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Supervisor(s) on the
                  terms set out under subparagraphs B(5)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease
                  practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Supervisor(s)
                  acceptable to the College.

            (h)   I, Dr. Adams, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a result
                  of subparagraph B(5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or
                  limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said term, condition and
                  limitation will be included on the public register.

            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to, under the guidance of my Supervisor(s),
                        participate in and successfully complete the following professional
                        education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        an educational program(s) satisfactory to the College in:
                  
                        (i)   medical record keeping;
                  
                        (ii)  Advanced Cardiac Life Support ("ACLS"); and
                  
                        (iii) Airway Intervention and Management in Emergencies ("AIME") or
                              Critical Care Airway Management.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in subparagraph B(4)(a) and (b).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adams, shall complete this requirement within six (6) months
                        of the date of this undertaking or, if no satisfactory program is
                        available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                        thereafter.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in subparagraph B(6)(a) and (b) as soon as possible.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in B(5) above
                        and Appendix "A" and "8" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment
                        of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under this term of the Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adams, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)' recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard. I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        subparagraph B(7) (d) above, I will abide by those recommendations
                        of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Adams, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and/or which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in subparagraph B(7)(d) as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within  fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College lo monitor my compliance with
                        the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent form
                        is part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Adams, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (I 0) I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to   the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Adams, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Adams has been the subject of a College investigation into
                        allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct by failing
                        to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is
                        incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the
                        investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Adams will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of twelve
                              (12) months.
                  
                              Dr. Adams will engage in professional education.
                  
                              Dr. Adams' practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of
                              the period of supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (I 4) I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in paragraph B(4) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff'), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Adams, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in paragraph 8(6)
                  above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff and Assessors
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to  this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "A" and "B".
                  
                  (c)   relevant  to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at paragraph B(6) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 27, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Frederick Adams to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 27, 2015:

Dr. Adams has been the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct by failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Adams will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Adams will engage in professional education.

Dr. Adams' practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of supervision.