Adams, Susan Jane (CPSO#: 64883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forensic Psychiatry Program
St Josephs Healthcare - Hamilton
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39092
Fax: (905) 381-5606
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JANE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1995