Adamson, Peter Allan (CPSO#: 25872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renaissance Plaza
150 Bloor Street West
Suite M110
Toronto ON  M5S 2X9
Phone: (416) 323-3900
Fax: (416) 323-1344
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 225
162 Cumberland Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
Fax: (416) 925-3336
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ALLAN ADAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981