Adamson, Sandra Coleen (CPSO#: 91062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4400 Ext. 3272
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Archdekin Medical Group
205 Hiram Street
Box 660
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-2223
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Adamson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Adamson ( CPSO# 91062 )

Business Address:
Archdekin Medical Group
Box 660
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Phone Number: (705) 645-2223

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA COLEEN ADAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011