Adanlawo, Adewumi Moses (CPSO#: 99981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Regina General Hospital
1440 14th Street
Regina SK  S4P 0W5
Phone: 3067660536
Fax: (306) 7664453

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria
Saskatchewan
South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEWUMI MOSES ADANLAWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADANLAWO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013