Adatia, Feisal (CPSO#: 79510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mitchell Eye Centre
100, 5340 1st St. SW
www.dradatia.com
Calgary AB  T2H 0C8
Phone: (403) 258-1773
Fax: (403) 770-8555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEISAL ADATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADATIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010