Adatia, Ian Thomas Kassam (CPSO#: 57544)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003