Addae, Gina Akosua Oseiwa (CPSO#: 56078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Ga-Adangme-Krobo

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90A Isabella Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 1N4
Phone: (416) 929-7729
Electoral District: 10


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GINA AKOSUA OSEIWA ADDAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDAE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 1991