Adeli, Gholam Mohammed Gholam Ali (CPSO#: 76899)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Damascus, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 22 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2003 to 22 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006