Adelson, Edward Israel (CPSO#: 23361)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2009