Adesanya, Augustine Tunde (CPSO#: 53341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Office Building
Timmins and District Hospital
Suite C
640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 268-9788
Fax: (705) 268-2077
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.T. Adesanya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adesanya ( CPSO# 53341 )

Business Address:
Timmins & District Hospital
C - 640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 268-9788

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
58 Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-3911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE TUNDE ADESANYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADESANYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1985