Adiga, Samyuktha (CPSO#: 101635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Suite 136A
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Citrus Medical Centre
398 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 2R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMYUKTHA ADIGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIGA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015