Adili, Anthony (CPSO#: 71227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
8th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6062
Fax: (905) 540-6577
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Adili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adili ( CPSO# 71227 )

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
7 - 49 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 648-6500

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
8th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6062

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ADILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2003