Adkins, Lawrence John (CPSO#: 58315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia X-Ray and Ultrasound Inc.
16 O'Brien St .
Orillia ON  L3V5S2
Phone: (705) 327-0744
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Adkins ( CPSO# 58315 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9130

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE JOHN ADKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988