Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Adleman, Neil Lorne (CPSO#: 50052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 273-4055
Fax: (905) 273-4969
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL LORNE ADLEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1986