Adler Nevo, Gili Wendy (CPSO#: 82322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Ave.
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3229
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Ave.
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6833
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Nevo and G.W. Adler Nevo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Adler Nevo ( CPSO# 82322 )
Dr. O. Nevo ( CPSO# 80168 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4-170
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4920

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room A613
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2005 to 22 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Gili  Wendy  Adler  Nevo  may practise medicine independently in child and
            adolescent psychiatry, including  on-call  duties  in  general  psychiatry in a
            hospital setting, only.