Adu-Poku, Yaw (CPSO#: 63266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adu-Poku Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 May 2013

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  September 21, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On September 12, 2013, Quinte Health Care notifited the College that Dr. Adu-Poku's privileges were suspended, effective September 21, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013