Adunuri, Nikesh Reddy (CPSO#: 103400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-663-3584
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKESH REDDY ADUNURI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ADUNURI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ADUNURI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ADUNURI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ADUNURI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ADUNURI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ADUNURI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018