Advani, Andrew (CPSO#: 88172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Dept of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room 6 151
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 8413
Fax: (416) 867-3696
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 01 Apr 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrew Advani may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        University of Toronto, in which Dr. Advani holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Advani no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.