Advent, Donald Anthony (CPSO#: 31482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie, ON
L4N 7L3
Barrie & Community FHT
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: (705) 721-0370 Ext. 8
Fax: (705) 725-4708
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald A. Advent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Advent ( CPSO# 31482 )

Business Address:
370 Bayview Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1977 to 15 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Jan 2005

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Jan 2005 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  January 14, 2005, Dr. Donald Anthony Advent undertakes to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College") the following:

            1.    Dr. Advent  undertakes  not  to  provide  or  co-sign  prescriptions  for
                  patients  whom  he  has  not personally attended, whether in consultation
                  with an "Internet prescribing company" or otherwise.

            2.    Dr. Advent undertakes to consult  and abide by the College's most current
                  policy  or  policies on prescribing practices,  which  are  available  at
                  www.cpso.on.ca.