Advincula, Edgardo Galpo (CPSO#: 24822)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 18 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998