Adzich, Kim Peter (CPSO#: 59116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara West Palliative Care Team
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main St East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: 905-945-2250 Ext. 413
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM PETER ADZICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADZICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017