Aedy, Lawrence Joel (CPSO#: 52335)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016