Affleck, Andrew William (CPSO#: 53062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6115
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

197 Chercover Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7G 1A6
Canada
Phone: (807) 767-6729
Fax: (807) 767-6729
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Affleck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Affleck ( CPSO# 53062 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5V4
Phone Number: (807) 343-8397

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM AFFLECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFFLECK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1985