Afif, Waqqas (CPSO#: 83262)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2010