Afsar, Afsaneh (CPSO#: 62386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3025 Hurontario Street
Suite 302
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1
Phone: (905) 279-6661
Fax: (905) 279-0319
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Afsar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Afsar ( CPSO# 62386 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
3025 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1
Phone Number: (905) 279-6661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSANEH AFSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFSAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991