Afshar, Maryam (CPSO#: 97087)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ankara, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Credit Valley Hospital, 100 Queensway West, Missisauga, ON L5B 1B8
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016