Afshari-Azad, Nahid (CPSO#: 53081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: Azad-Sabour, Nahid Afshari (used until: 15 Dec 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4195
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Afshari-Azad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Afshari-Azad ( CPSO# 53081 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4195

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAHID AFSHARI-AZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFSHARI-AZAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988