Agameya, Abdel Fattah Mohamed Abdel-Aziz (CPSO#: 72958)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1999