Agarwal, Anil (CPSO#: 80354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 822-7347
Fax: (519) 822-2123
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

3980 Grand Park Drive, Unit A-2
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 615-0107
Fax: (905) 615-1711
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Agarwal ( CPSO# 80354 )

Business Address:
103 - 77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 822-7347

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
Unit A-2
3980 Grand Park Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Phone Number: (905) 615-0107

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Sep 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008