Agarwal, Parul (CPSO#: 87960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2041
Fax: (416) 368-3192
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhatia Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Agarwal ( CPSO# 87960 )
Dr. A. Bhatia ( CPSO# 87551 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
MCL 2- 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARUL AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 25 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010