Agarwal, Prachi Pragya (CPSO#: 79138)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lucknow, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 May 2003 to 25 Jun 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005