Agarwal, Sanjay (CPSO#: 68030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjay Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agarwal ( CPSO# 68030 )

Business Address:
200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996