Agarwal, Sanjay (CPSO#: 69828)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:West Virginia University, 1989

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 15 Mar 1997
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 1997