Agarwala, Vinod Kumar (CPSO#: 22023)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1861 Rideau Garden Drive Ottawa, ON K1S 1G5
Date Received: 01 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016