Agbayani, Regina Natividad (CPSO#: 66929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albion-Kipling Medical Centre
1525 Albion Road
Suite 206
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 744-7890
Fax: (416) 744-8106
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Regina Agbayani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Agbayani ( CPSO# 66929 )

Business Address:
Albion-Kipling Medical Centre
Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 744-7890

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REGINA NATIVIDAD AGBAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGBAYANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995